Enlisted in the California Air National Guard, 6 Dec 1952 and was released to join the Marine Corps 12 Jan 1954. I was assigned to the 144th Maintenance Squadron, 144th Fighter Wing, Hayward ANG, Base, as an Airman 3rd Class. I was a 4601 Munitions and Weapons Mechanic. Our squadron had 12 F51-H Fighters, 2 AT6 Trainers, 1 B26 Bomber and 1 C47 Transport.
Shipped out overseas with the 33rd replacement draft, 30 Jul 1954, aboard the USNS Marine Phoenix (TAP-195) from San Diego. Crossed Latitude 35 degrees/Longitude 180 degrees 00' August 7th, 1954 and became a Trusty Golden Dragon. We sail on to Sasabo, Japan, then on to Inchon. Arrived 17 Aug 1954. Stayed at Ascom City a few days, then joined Hq Battery, 11th Marines who were just a couple of miles east of Munsan-ni, South Korea. Departed Inchon, Korea 27 Feb 1955 aboard the USS George Clymer (APA-27) and arrived at San Diego, CA on 17 Mar 1955. We march in the St. Patrick's Day Parade from the water front to Balboa Park were we were trucked to Camp Pendelton.
Other Comments:
1966 enlisted in the US Naval Reserve. Was an 8286 Aviation Ordnanceman stationed at Alameda NAS, CA. I was an Aircrew member flying SP2-E Anti Submarine Patrol Aircraft. First in Squadron VP-871, then in VP-71. I was discharged in 1970 as a Petty Officer 1st Class.
1970 Enlisted in the USAFR at Travis AFB, CA., flying as an aircraft loadmaster on C-141s (708th MAS). 1973 transfered to C-5A's (312th MAS). I was an instructor and aircrew flight examiner. Flew many missions in country. The best of these missions were flying the grunts back to the real world. I was activated to active duty during Nam, Panama and the first Gulf War. Desert Shield, Storm and Somalia. I retired in 1995 with 25 years of service in the Air Force and Air Force Reserve as a Senior Master Sgt (E-8). Not bad for a Marine PFC.